OK HB1104 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Feral swine; requiring certain persons to kill all feral swine upon capture; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Feral swine; requiring certain persons to kill all feral swine upon capture; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-11 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 53 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11HouseLaid over
2015-03-11HousePlaced on Third Reading
2015-03-11HouseMotion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 53 Nays: 29
2015-03-09HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Biggs
2015-03-09HouseThird Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 58
2015-03-09HouseAmended
2015-03-09HouseAuthored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author)
2015-03-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Murdock, Pfeiffer
2015-03-09HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-18HouseEmergency added
2015-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Biggs
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
26602New CodeSee Bill Text
26608New CodeSee Bill Text
26609New CodeSee Bill Text
26613New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback