OK HB1098 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing serving of samples at retail spirit license locations; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; authorizing serving of samples at retail spirit license locations; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2021-03-04Senatecoauthored by Bell
2021-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 26
2021-03-03HouseAuthored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author)
2021-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Strom
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback