OK HB1083 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-15 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; modifying definitions under the Oklahoma Emergency Response Systems Development Act; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; modifying definitions under the Oklahoma Emergency Response Systems Development Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Sen. Frank Simpson [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-15 | House | Approved by Governor 04/12/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-09 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman |
2013-03-04 | House | General Order |
2013-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Ownbey |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 2503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2505 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2508 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 2511 | New Code | See Bill Text |