OK HB1080 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma Veterans Commission; modifying appointment process for Commission members; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Soldiers and sailors; Oklahoma Veterans Commission; modifying appointment process for Commission members; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: Government Modernization and: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-23SenateFirst Reading
2023-03-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-03-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-03-22HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2023-03-22HouseTitle stricken
2023-03-22HouseAmended
2023-03-22HouseHouse Rule suspended
2023-03-22HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2023-03-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Roberts, Ranson, Roe
2023-03-22HouseRemove as coauthor Representative(s) Grego
2023-03-22HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-15HouseEmergency added
2023-02-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Menz, Talley, West (Kevin), Fugate, Hardin, Grego, West (Tammy), Caldwell (Trey), Cornwell, Baker, Kendrix, Townley
2023-02-15HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization and Technology Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Modernization and Technology
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Steagall
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1080&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB1080%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1080%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB1080%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB1080%20ENGR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1080%20FULLAMD1%20JAY%20STEAGALL-EK.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1080%20FA1%20STEAGALLJA-EK.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1080%20FA2%20STEAGALLJA-EK(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1080%20FA3%20OSBURNMI-CC.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1080%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1080%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1080%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1080%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1080_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback