OK HB1079 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/24/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Utilities; creating the Electric Usage Data Protection Act; effective date.
Title
Utilities; creating the Electric Usage Data Protection Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - House - House: Conference Committee on Natural Resources: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Energy & Utility Regulation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/24/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-18 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-17 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 40 Nays: 1 | |
2011-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | CCR read | |
2011-05-16 | To Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4 | |
2011-05-16 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Title restored | |
2011-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-04 | Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Branan, Myers, Marlatt, Burrage, Eason McIntyre | |
2011-05-02 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Natural Resources | |
2011-04-26 | SA's received | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-25 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 | |
2011-04-25 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-04-04 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-04 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 10 | |
2011-03-16 | General Order | |
2011-02-24 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sears | |
2011-02-24 | Remove Representative Sears as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martin (Scott) | |
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Energy and Utility Regulation Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Utility Regulation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sears | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 710 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 710 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 710 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 710 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 710 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 710 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 710 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 710 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |