OK HB1074 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; deleting requirement that canteen service operations be performed by state employees. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; deleting requirement that canteen service operations be performed by state employees. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-02-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-02-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 60 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Died in conference | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-30 | HC's named: Cooksey, Terrill, Banz, Liebmann, Duncan, Brannon, Roan, Renegar, Tibbs | |
2009-04-27 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-16 | SA's received | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 | |
2009-04-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-26 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-26 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-12 | First Reading | |
2009-02-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 20 | |
2009-02-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton, Terrill | |
2009-02-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-05 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-05 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Cooksey | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |