OK HB1069 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1069
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; creating the Victims of Impaired Driving Memorial Sign Act of 2019; creating the Victims of Impaired Driving Memorial Sign Program; codification; effective date.
Title
Motor vehicles; creating the Victims of Impaired Driving Memorial Sign Act of 2019; creating the Victims of Impaired Driving Memorial Sign Program; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 3 |
2019-02-25 | House | Title stricken |
2019-02-25 | House | Amended |
2019-02-25 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Pae |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1069 (Carry Over) 2019-04-02 - Referred to Appropriations