OK HB1069 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; modifying scope of database to include certain persons; effective date.
Title
State government; modifying scope of database to include certain persons; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: Public Health Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cleveland |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |