OK HB1055 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Definitions and general provisions; designating the Colonial Spanish Mustang/Heritage Horse of Oklahoma as the state horse; codification; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions and general provisions; designating the Colonial Spanish Mustang/Heritage Horse of Oklahoma as the state horse; codification; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseLaid over
2021-03-11HouseAmended
2021-03-11HouseHouse Rule suspended
2021-03-11HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-25HouseAuthored by Senator Stephens (principal Senate author)
2021-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
2021-02-25HouseReferred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
2021-02-25HouseWithdrawn from General Government Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to General Government
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Randleman
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1055&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB1055%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB1055%20HFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1055%20FA1%20RANDLEMANRA-JBH(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1055%20FA1-A1%20CALDWELLTR-JBH(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB1055%20FA2%20CALDWELLTR-JBH(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1055%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1055%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1055%20FA1-A1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1055%20FA2%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1055_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback