OK HB1053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Title restored
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; creating the Out-of-Network Surprise Billing Transparency Act; instructing the Oklahoma Insurance Department to promulgate rules for implementation of program; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; creating the Out-of-Network Surprise Billing Transparency Act; instructing the Oklahoma Insurance Department to promulgate rules for implementation of program; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseTitle restored
2019-05-16HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Treat
2019-05-16HouseRemove Senator Treat as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Quinn
2019-05-16HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Treat, Quinn, Stanislawski, Montgomery, Brooks, Matthews
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance
2019-04-29HouseSA's received
2019-04-29SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-04-25SenateTitle stricken
2019-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-08SenateReported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-03-07HouseAmended
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McCall
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-02-14HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1053&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1053%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1053%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1053%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1053%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1053%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1053%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1053%20CCS.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1053_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1053_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback