OK HB1043 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1043
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; payment; child care provider; reimbursement; Department of Human Services; codification; effective date; emergency.
Title
Child care; payment; child care provider; reimbursement; Department of Human Services; codification; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Randleman |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1043 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee