OK HB1037 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Open Records Act; providing additional exemption under Oklahoma Open Records Act; release of certain audio and video recordings; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Open Records Act; providing additional exemption under Oklahoma Open Records Act; release of certain audio and video recordings; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Government Oversight and Accountability Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-22HouseApproved by Governor 06/04/2015
2015-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2015-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-05-21HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-05-21HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-05-21SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
2015-05-21SenateCCR adopted
2015-05-20SenateRemove as coauthor Senator Matthews
2015-05-19Senatecoauthored by Walker
2015-05-19SenateCCR read
2015-05-19HouseTo Senate
2015-05-19HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6
2015-05-19HouseCCR adopted
2015-05-14HouseEmergency restored
2015-05-14HouseTitle restored
2015-05-14HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Matthews
2015-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2015-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named Holt, Justice, Marlatt, Treat, Griffin, Paddack, Bass
2015-04-28HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Oversight and Accountability
2015-04-22HouseSA's received
2015-04-22SenateEngrossed to House
2015-04-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2015-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2015-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-04-08SenateEmergency clause stricken
2015-04-08SenateTitle stricken
2015-04-08SenateEmergency added
2015-04-08SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed
2015-03-11SenateCoauthored by Quinn
2015-03-11SenateRemove as author Senator Quinn; authored by Holt
2015-03-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2015-03-03SenateFirst Reading
2015-03-03HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-03-02HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-03-02HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 12
2015-03-02HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Quinn (principal Senate author)
2015-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Faught
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5124A5New CodeSee Bill Text
5124A8New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1037&Session=1500
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20INT/hB/HB1037%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/HFLR/HB1037%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENGR/hB/HB1037%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1037%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20FLR/SFLR/HB1037%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1037%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCCS/HB1037%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2015-16%20ENR/hB/HB1037%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1037_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2015-16%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1037_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback