OK HB1034 | 2018 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor 03/06/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Approved by Governor 03/06/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax credits; coal; cap; effective date.
Title
Tax credits; coal; cap; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Approved by Governor 03/06/2018 |
2018-03-01 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-02-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 |
2018-02-26 | House | JCR adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | General Order |
2018-02-08 | House | JCR; Do Pass Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Casey |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |