OK HB1032 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1032
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; adjudicative hearings; time frame; exception; effective date.
Title
Children; adjudicative hearings; time frame; exception; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | House | Approved by Governor 04/19/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 1 |
2023-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) CrosswhiteHader |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1032 (Carry Over) 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/19/2023