OK HB1026 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1026
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; allowing CLEET to establish and certify certain programs at technology center schools; effective date.
Title
Council on Law Enforcement Education and Training; allowing CLEET to establish and certify certain programs at technology center schools; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-23 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1026 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/20/2021