OK HB1021 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - coauthored by Sykes
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - coauthored by Sykes
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; preventing enforcement of certain federal health care acts; emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; preventing enforcement of certain federal health care acts; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Mike Reynolds [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Rep. Mike Christian [R] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Dan Fisher [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | coauthored by Sykes |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 20 |
2013-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fisher, Christian |
2013-03-13 | House | General Order |
2013-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Reynolds, Murphey, Bennett |
2013-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Ritze |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 125 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |