OK HB1010 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1010
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Stanislawski
Pending: Senate Appr/Sub-Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-06 - Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Stanislawski
Pending: Senate Appr/Sub-Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; use of certain schedules; requiring adherence to rules, regulations, schedules and guides; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Ad Valorem Tax Code; use of certain schedules; requiring adherence to rules, regulations, schedules and guides; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: , THIRD READING (Y: 63 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Stanislawski |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 27 |
2017-03-21 | House | Amended |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Watson |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1010 (Carry Over) 2017-04-06 - Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Stanislawski