OK HB1007 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage; prohibiting requirement of religious official to solemnize a marriage that violates their conscience or religious beliefs; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage; prohibiting requirement of religious official to solemnize a marriage that violates their conscience or religious beliefs; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-04HouseApproved by Governor 05/01/2015
2015-04-27HouseSent to Governor
2015-04-27SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2015-04-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2015-04-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2015-04-22SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2015-04-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
2015-04-22SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2015-04-07Senatecoauthored by Brecheen
2015-04-07SenateRemove as author Senator Brecheen; authored by Senator Newberry
2015-04-07SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2015-03-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2015-02-16Senatecoauthored by Ritze, Cleveland
2015-02-16SenateFirst Reading
2015-02-16HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2015-02-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2015-02-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 7
2015-02-12HouseAuthored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author)
2015-02-12HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, McCullough
2015-02-12HouseGeneral Order
2015-02-05HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee
2015-02-03HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure
2015-02-02HouseAuthored by Representative Brumbaugh
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4371Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback