OK HB1003 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; plumbers; removing Committee from sunset law; adoption of rules and procedures for certain military training; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; plumbers; removing Committee from sunset law; adoption of rules and procedures for certain military training; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3 |
2015-03-03 | House | General Order |
2015-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Barrington (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Labor, and Retirement Laws |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative McDaniel (Randy) |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |