OH SR406 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-14 - Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To designate April 26, 2020, as Diabetic Ketoacidosis (DKA) Day.
Title
Designate Diabetic Ketoacidosis (DKA) Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | Senate | Reported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Offered |