OH SCR14 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-04 - Introduced and Referred to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the Congress of the United States and the President of the United States to take certain actions to counter manipulation of the oil market by the Organization of Petroleum Exporting Countries (OPEC).
Title
Take action to counter oil market manipulation by OPEC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-11-30 | House | Offered |
2017-11-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-11-16 | Senate | Reported: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Offered |