OH SB77 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Reported - Amended: Transportation and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-09 - Reported - Amended: Transportation and Public Safety
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4501.21 and 4503.98 and to enact section 4503.4910 of the Revised Code to create the "KylerStrong Foundation" license plate and to make changes to the "Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation" and "Westerville Parks Foundation" license plates.
Title
Create KylerStrong Foundation license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-09 | House | Reported - Amended: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-09-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-06-22 | House | Introduced |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
45 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
45 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 01 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 4910 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 03 | 4991 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 03 | 98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |