OH SB77 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-10-10 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2007 - 100% progression
Action: 2007-10-10 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend sections 1531.10, 1533.34, 1533.341, 1533.342, 1533.35, 1533.36, 1533.42, 1533.62, 1533.63, 1533.631, and 1533.64 and to enact sections 1533.343 and 1533.641 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law governing commercial fishing and to create the Ohio Lake Erie Fishing Regulatory Reform Task Force to evaluate certain fisheries management practices with respect to Lake Erie and to make recommendations to the General Assembly and the Division of Wildlife in the Department of Natural Resources regarding statutory, rulemaking, and regulatory changes.
Title
Commercial fishing-fees/penalties/etc
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-10-10 | Effective Date | |
2007-07-10 | Governor Action | |
2007-07-14 | End of 10-day Period | |
2007-07-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-05-15 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-05-10 | Committee Report | |
2007-02-22 | To Environment & Natural Resources | |
2007-02-22 | Introduced to House | |
2007-06-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2007-06-26 | Committee Report | |
2007-05-16 | To Agriculture & Natural Resources | |
2007-05-16 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_77 |