OH SB6 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-20)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Effective 9/30/21 - Appropriations effective July 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-20)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Effective 9/30/21 - Appropriations effective July 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3721.28, 3721.31, and 3721.32 and to enact sections 4731.11, 4731.111, and 4731.112 of the Revised Code to enter into the Interstate Medical Licensure Compact, to revise the law governing nurse aide training and competency evaluation programs, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Enter into Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Effective 9/30/21 - Appropriations effective July 1, 2021 | |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2021-06-23 | House | Passed |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services |
2021-05-04 | House | Refer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported: Health |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 21 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 21 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 21 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 31 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 31 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 31 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |