OH SB55 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-05 - Reported: Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2925.01 and 2925.03 of the Revised Code to enhance penalties for certain drug trafficking offenses committed in the vicinity of a substance addiction services provider and to name the act's provisions the "Relapse Reduction Act."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhance penalty for drug offense near addiction services provider

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-05HouseReported: Criminal Justice
2019-05-22HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-04-03SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2019-02-26SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2925Amended CodeCitation Text
292501Amended CodeCitation Text
292503Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback