OH SB53 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2923.11 of the Revised Code to clarify that certain firearms are not "dangerous ordnance" and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarify certain firearms not dangerous ordnance

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12HouseIntroduced
2019-02-26SenatePassed
2019-02-26SenateReported: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-02-20SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2923Amended CodeCitation Text
292311Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback