OH SB52 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Effective 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-28 - Effective 10/11/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4906.01, 4906.02, and 4906.10 and to enact sections 303.57, 303.58, 303.59, 303.60, 303.61, 303.62, 4906.021, 4906.022, 4906.023, 4906.024, 4906.025, 4906.101, 4906.102, 4906.103, 4906.21, 4906.211, 4906.212, 4906.22, 4906.221, 4906.222, 4906.30, and 4906.31 of the Revised Code to permit a board of county commissioners to prevent power siting board certification of certain wind and solar facilities, to provide for ad hoc members of the power siting board, and to establish decommissioning requirements for certain wind and solar facilities.
Title
Revise law governing wind farms and solar facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 52 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Effective 10/11/21 | |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2021-06-28 | House | Passed - Amended |
2021-06-28 | House | Reported - Substitute: Public Utilities |
2021-06-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Public Utilities |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Passed |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
State and Local Government : Local Government
State and Local Government : State Government
Utilities : Electric Utilities
State and Local Government : State Government
Utilities : Electric Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 03 | 57 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 03 | 58 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 03 | 59 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 03 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 03 | 61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 03 | 62 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 06 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 06 | 021 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 023 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 024 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 06 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 211 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 221 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 222 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 06 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |