OH SB5 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 31 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-31 - Governor' Action
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 9.81, 9.90, 9.901, 102.02, 103.74, 109.33, 122.40, 122.64, 122.72, 124.11, 124.134, 124.14, 124.15, 124.152, 124.181, 124.322, 124.325, 124.34, 124.38, 124.382, 124.388, 124.39, 124.81, 124.82, 126.32, 141.01, 141.02, 145.012, 145.47, 306.04, 307.054, 339.06, 339.07, 340.04, 505.38, 505.49, 505.60, 709.012, 742.31, 742.63, 749.082, 749.083, 917.03, 927.69, 991.02, 1349.71, 1509.35, 1513.182, 1513.29, 1545.071, 1551.35, 1707.36, 1707.46, 3301.03, 3304.12, 3306.01, 3307.27, 3307.77, 3309.47, 3311.19, 3313.12, 3313.202, 3313.23, 3313.24, 3313.33, 3313.42, 3314.10, 3316.07, 3317.01, 3317.018, 3317.11, 3317.13, 3319.01, 3319.011, 3319.02, 3319.06, 3319.08, 3319.084, 3319.085, 3319.088, 3319.09, 3319.10, 3319.11, 3319.111, 3319.13, 3319.14, 3319.141, 3319.17, 3319.172, 3319.18, 3319.61, 3319.63, 3326.18, 3332.03, 3701.33, 3737.81, 3737.90, 3770.02, 3772.06, 3773.33, 3781.07, 4112.03, 4117.01, 4117.02, 4117.03, 4117.05, 4117.06, 4117.07, 4117.08, 4117.09, 4117.10, 4117.11, 4117.12, 4117.13, 4117.14, 4117.15, 4117.18, 4117.20, 4117.21, 4123.352, 4301.07, 4517.30, 4701.03, 4701.05, 4703.03, 4703.31, 4709.04, 4715.06, 4717.02, 4723.02, 4725.06, 4725.46, 4729.03, 4730.05, 4731.03, 4732.05, 4733.05, 4734.03, 4738.09, 4741.02, 4747.03, 4753.04, 4755.01, 4757.05, 4758.12, 4759.03, 4761.02, 4763.02, 4775.05, 4905.10, 4906.02, 4911.07, 5107.26, 5119.09, 5123.51, 5126.24, 5139.02, 5503.03, 5505.15, and 5703.09, to enact new section 3319.112 and sections 124.94, 4113.80, 4117.081, 4117.104, 4117.105, 4117.106, 4117.107, 4117.108, 4117.109, 4117.141, 4117.26, and 4117.27, and to repeal sections 3317.12, 3317.14, 3319.112, 3319.131, 3319.142, 3319.143, 4117.16, 4117.22, and 4117.23 of the Revised Code to make various changes to laws concerning public employees, including collective bargaining, salary schedules and compensation, layoff procedures, and leave.
Title
To make various changes to laws concerning public employees, including collective bargaining, salary schedules and compensation, layoff procedures, and leave.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Amendment (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 15 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Governor' Action | |
2011-04-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-03-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-03-02 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-02-01 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced to House | |
2011-03-30 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-03 | To Commerce and Labor | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced to Senate |