OH SB47 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective 7/6/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4111.03 and 4111.10 and to enact section 4111.031 of the Revised Code to except traveling to and from a worksite and performing certain routine tasks from the overtime pay requirement and to prohibit opt-out class actions for overtime violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excepts certain tasks from overtime pay requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 56 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-30 Effective 7/6/22
2022-03-30SenateConcurred in House amendments
2022-03-23HousePassed
2022-03-09HouseReported - Substitute: Commerce and Labor
2021-10-12HouseRefer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
2021-09-22SenatePassed
2021-09-15SenateReported: Ways and Means
2021-02-10SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-02-03SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411103Amended CodeCitation Text
4111031New CodeSee Bill Text
411110Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-47
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb47/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb47/RS/01/sb47_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb47/PS/02/sb47_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb47/RH/03/sb47_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb47/PH/04/sb47_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb47/EN/05/sb47_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15637&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16226&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17367&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17370&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17451&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17653&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18579&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18615&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18679&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18778&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18853&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18957&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-47

Bill Comments

feedback