OH SB42 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2950.02, 2950.034, and 2950.04 of the Revised Code to specify that the restriction against offenders convicted of a sexually oriented offense or child-victim oriented offense establishing or occupying a residence near school, preschool, or child day-care premises generally applies regardless of when the offense was committed or the offender began living in the residence, to provide an exemption from the ban for offenders who occupy residential premises they or their spouse own at the time of occupancy and also owned prior to the ban's effective date, and to specify that a registration requirement for children adjudicated delinquent for a sexually oriented offense and classified a juvenile offender registrant applies regardless of when the offense was committed.
Title
To specify that the restriction against offenders convicted of a sexually oriented offense or child-victim oriented offense establishing or occupying a residence near school, preschool, or child day-care premises generally applies regardless of when the offense was committed or the offender began living in the residence, to provide an exemption from the ban for offenders who occupy residential premises they or their spouse own at the time of occupancy and also owned prior to the ban's effective date, and to specify that a registration requirement for children adjudicated delinquent for a sexually oriented offense and classified a juvenile offender registrant applies regardless of when the offense was committed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Report - S | |
2009-02-10 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced to House | |
2009-03-11 | To Judiciary | |
2009-03-11 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 50 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 50 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |