OH SB40 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-9)
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Effective 9/30/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 1333.11, 1333.12, 1333.14, and 1333.15 and to enact section 1333.13 of the Revised Code regarding cigarette minimum pricing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards cigarette minimum pricing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30 Effective 9/30/21
2021-06-24HousePassed
2021-06-23HouseReported: Ways and Means
2021-05-11HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-05-05SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateReported: Ways and Means
2021-02-03SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2021-02-02SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
133311Amended CodeCitation Text
133312Amended CodeCitation Text
133313New CodeSee Bill Text
133314Amended CodeCitation Text
133315Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-40
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb40/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb40/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb40/IN/00/sb40_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb40/PS/02/sb40_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb40/RH/03/sb40_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb40/PH/04/sb40_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb40/EN/05/sb40_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15534&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15643&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16457&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16476&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16621&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16698&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17164&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17169&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17161&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17233&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17261&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17333&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-40

Bill Comments

feedback