OH SB346 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-13 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-13 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2529 of the Revised Code to designate April 27 as "Ulysses S. Grant Day."
Title
Designate Ulysses S. Grant Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-13 | House | Refer to Committee: State and Local Government |
2022-12-12 | House | Introduced |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Passed |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Introduced |