OH SB341 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 4723.11, 4723.111, 4723.112, 4723.113, 4723.114, and 4723.115 of the Revised Code to enter into the Nurse Licensure Compact.
Title
Enter into Nurse Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Passed |
2020-12-09 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid |
2020-07-21 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 23 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 23 | 115 | New Code | See Bill Text |