OH SB31 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 28 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Conference managers: Sens. - Eklund, Roegner, Thomas
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 149.43, 4123.88, and 5913.01 and to enact sections 107.22 and 3701.25 of the Revised Code to present section 149.45 of the Revised Code to confirm its harmonization, to include emergency service telecommunicators, certain Ohio National Guard members, federal judges, regional physician advisory board members, and first responders as individuals whose residential and familial information is exempt from disclosure under the Public Records Law, to address matters related to contact tracing, and to require the Bureau of Workers' Compensation or Industrial Commission to disclose a claimant's name to a journalist upon written request.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempt EMS telecommunicator info from Public Records Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-03 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 12 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-05-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16SenateConference managers: Sens. - Eklund, Roegner, Thomas
2020-09-16HouseInsist on amendments; asks for committee of conference
2020-06-03SenateRefused to concur in House amendments
2020-05-28HousePassed
2020-05-28HouseReported - Substitute: Civil Justice
2019-04-16HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-03SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2019-02-13SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
10722New CodeSee Bill Text
149Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
370125New CodeSee Bill Text
412388Amended CodeCitation Text
59Amended CodeCitation Text
5913Amended CodeCitation Text
591301Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback