OH SB3 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 12 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-11 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 103.051, 103.0511, 121.24, 122.08, 122.081, and 127.18 and to enact sections 121.81, 121.811, 121.812, 121.813, 121.814, 121.815, 121.82, 122.084, and 3745.016 of the Revised Code to enact the Common Sense Regulation Act to improve state agency regulatory processes, especially as they relate to small businesses, to require state departments to develop customer service training programs, and to require the Director of Environmental Protection to provide environmental regulatory compliance assistance to small businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To enact the Common Sense Regulation Act to improve state agency regulatory processes, especially as they relate to small businesses, to require state departments to develop customer service training programs, and to require the Director of Environmental Protection to provide environmental regulatory compliance assistance to small businesses.

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Rep. Nan Baker [R]
Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]Rep. Robin Belcher [D]Rep. Terry Blair [R]
Rep. Linda Bolon [D]Rep. Terry Boose [R]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Sen. Stephen Buehrer [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. John Carey [R]Rep. John Carney [D]
Sen. Gary Cates [R]Rep. Kathleen Chandler [D]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]
Sen. Kevin Coughlin [R]Sen. David Daniels [R]Rep. Michael DeBose [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Daniel Dodd [D]Rep. John Domenick [D]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Stephen Dyer [D]
Rep. Clyde Evans [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]
Rep. Mike Foley [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Rep. Jennifer Garrison [D]
Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]Sen. Bob Gibbs [R]Sen. Karen Gillmor [R]Sen. David Goodman [R]
Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Jay Goyal [D]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. John Hagan [R]
Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Marian Harris [D]Rep. Sandra Harwood [D]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]
Rep. Dale Mallory [D]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Rep. Mike Moran [D]Rep. Seth Morgan [R]Rep. Dennis Murray [D]
Rep. Deborah Newcomb [D]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Matt Patten [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Raymond Pryor [D]
Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Rep. Allan Sayre [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Mark Schneider [D]
Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]Rep. Todd Snitchler [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]
Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Sen. Jimmy Stewart [R]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Rep. Jeff Wagner [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Rep. Joe Walter [D]Rep. Brian Williams [D]
Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]Rep. James Zehringer [R]

Roll Calls

2010-05-18 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 11 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-11 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-03-11 Committee Report - A
2009-02-10 To State & Local Government & Veterans Affairs
2009-02-10 Introduced to House
2010-05-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2010-04-21 Committee Report - S
2009-03-17 To State Government
2009-03-17 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
103Amended CodeCitation Text
103051Amended CodeCitation Text
1030511Amended CodeCitation Text
111Amended CodeCitation Text
11115Amended CodeCitation Text
117Amended CodeCitation Text
11720Amended CodeCitation Text
119Amended CodeCitation Text
11903Amended CodeCitation Text
119031Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
121021New CodeSee Bill Text
12124Repealed CodeCitation Text
12125New CodeSee Bill Text
121251New CodeSee Bill Text
121252New CodeSee Bill Text
121253New CodeSee Bill Text
121254New CodeSee Bill Text
12139Amended CodeCitation Text
12181New CodeSee Bill Text
121811New CodeSee Bill Text
121812New CodeSee Bill Text
121813New CodeSee Bill Text
121814New CodeSee Bill Text
121815New CodeSee Bill Text
12182New CodeSee Bill Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12208Amended CodeCitation Text
122081Amended CodeCitation Text
122084New CodeSee Bill Text
12294Amended CodeCitation Text
124Amended CodeCitation Text
12404Amended CodeCitation Text
12495New CodeSee Bill Text
127Amended CodeCitation Text
12718Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1710Amended CodeCitation Text
171002Amended CodeCitation Text
37New CodeSee Bill Text
3745New CodeSee Bill Text
3745016New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback