OH SB297 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4731.293 of the Revised Code to specify requirements for obtaining and renewing a clinical research faculty certificate and to declare an emergency.
Title
To specify requirements for obtaining and renewing a clinical research faculty certificate and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-03-22 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-02-14 | To Health, Human Services, & Aging | |
2012-02-14 | Introduced to House | |
2012-05-17 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-03-28 | To Health & Aging | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 31 | 293 | Amended Code | Citation Text |