OH SB296 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-8)
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-27 - Passed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 101.27, 141.01, 141.011, 141.04, 325.03, 325.04, 325.06, 325.08, 325.09, 325.10, 325.11, 325.14, 325.15, 325.18, 505.24, 507.09, 742.63, and 3501.12 and to enact sections 101.61, 107.71, and 124.824 of the Revised Code to revise the payments that surviving family members receive from the Ohio Public Safety Officers Death Benefit Fund and to permit surviving spouses and children to participate in the health, dental, and vision benefits offered to state employees as if the survivors were employees of this state; to increase the compensation of elected public officers through 2028; to create the Public Office Compensation Advisory Commission; to create the Office of InnovateOhio; to allow the Lieutenant Governor to receive the salary of the head of an office within the Governor's office in lieu of the Lieutenant Governor's statutory salary; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provide health benefits to survivors of safety officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 67 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-27HousePassed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
2018-12-27HouseExcused from Voting on Legislation Letter
2018-12-27HouseExcused from Voting on Legislation Letter
2018-12-27SenatePassed notwithstanding objections of the Governor
2018-12-27SenateVeto receipt
2018-12-13SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-12-13HousePassed - Amended
2018-12-13HouseMotion to reconsider
2018-12-13HouseFailed passage
2018-12-12HouseReported - Substitute: Finance
2018-06-20HouseRefer to Committee: Finance
2018-06-07HouseIntroduced
2018-06-06SenatePassed
2018-06-06SenateReported - Amended: Finance
2018-05-10SenateRefer to Committee: Finance
2018-05-07SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
101Amended CodeCitation Text
10127Amended CodeCitation Text
10161New CodeSee Bill Text
107New CodeSee Bill Text
10771New CodeSee Bill Text
124New CodeSee Bill Text
124824New CodeSee Bill Text
141Amended CodeCitation Text
14101Amended CodeCitation Text
141011Amended CodeCitation Text
14104Amended CodeCitation Text
3Amended CodeCitation Text
325Amended CodeCitation Text
32503Amended CodeCitation Text
32504Amended CodeCitation Text
32506Amended CodeCitation Text
32508Amended CodeCitation Text
32509Amended CodeCitation Text
32510Amended CodeCitation Text
32511Amended CodeCitation Text
32514Amended CodeCitation Text
32515Amended CodeCitation Text
32518Amended CodeCitation Text
35Amended CodeCitation Text
3501Amended CodeCitation Text
350112Amended CodeCitation Text
5Amended CodeCitation Text
505Amended CodeCitation Text
50524Amended CodeCitation Text
507Amended CodeCitation Text
50709Amended CodeCitation Text
7Amended CodeCitation Text
742Amended CodeCitation Text
74263Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-SB-296
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb296/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb296/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb296/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb296/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb296/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb296/CS/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb296/EN/06?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-SB-296

Bill Comments

feedback