OH SB293 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-13 - Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
Pending: House Government Accountability and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-11-13 - Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight
Pending: House Government Accountability and Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 106.021 and 106.03 and to enact sections 101.352, 101.353, 121.031, 121.93, 121.931, 121.932, and 121.933 of the Revised Code to require certain agencies to reduce the number of regulatory restrictions.
Title
Require agencies to reduce regulatory restrictions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-13 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Accountability and Oversight |
2018-07-02 | House | Introduced |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Passed |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Workforce |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
1 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 01 | 352 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 01 | 353 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
1 | 06 | 021 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 06 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
1 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
1 | 21 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 931 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 932 | New Code | See Bill Text |
1 | 21 | 933 | New Code | See Bill Text |