OH SB289 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-18)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 55-18)
Status: Passed on July 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-16 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3706.25 and 4928.01 of the Revised Code to include cogeneration technology using waste or byproduct gas from an air contaminant source as a renewable energy resource.
Title
To include cogeneration technology using waste or byproduct gas from an air contaminant source as a renewable energy resource.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 79 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-16 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-13 | Governor' Action | |
2012-04-17 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-04-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Concurrence | |
2012-03-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-03-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-02-02 | To Energy & Public Utilities | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced to House | |
2012-03-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-03-28 | Committee Report | |
2012-03-21 | To Public Utilities | |
2012-03-21 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
37 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
37 | 06 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 28 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |