OH SB269 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-15 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3770.03 and to enact section 3770.26 of the Revised Code to clarify that the Ohio Lottery Commission has the authority to conduct internet lottery gaming and to make other changes to the lottery law.
Title
Regards conduct of internet lottery games
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-15 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Passed |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform |
2021-11-30 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2021-11-23 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 70 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 70 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |