OH SB25 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-20 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 4141.09 and to enact sections 4141.50 to 4141.56 of the Revised Code to create the SharedWork Ohio Program and to declare an emergency.
Title
To create the SharedWork Ohio Program and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Peterson [R] | Sen. Frank LaRose [R] | Rep. William Seitz [R] | Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R] |
Sen. Joseph Uecker [R] | Sen. Kevin Bacon [R] | Sen. Cliff Hite [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-03-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-12 | To Commerce & Labor | |
2013-02-12 | Introduced to House | |
2013-03-21 | To Commerce, Labor and Technology | |
2013-03-21 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
41 | 41 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
41 | 41 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
41 | 41 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 41 | 51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 41 | 52 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 41 | 53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 41 | 54 | New Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 41 | 55 | New Code | See Bill Text |