OH SB244 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-10 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2907.22 of the Revised Code to amend the penalties for promoting prostitution.
Title
Amend penalties for promoting prostitution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2018-03-22 | House | Introduced |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Sex Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 07 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |