OH SB237 | 2023-2024 | 135th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred to committee: Civil Justice
Pending: House Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-18 - Referred to committee: Civil Justice
Pending: House Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2505.02 and to enact sections 2747.01, 2747.02, 2747.03, 2747.04, 2747.05, and 2747.06 of the Revised Code to enact the Uniform Public Expression Protection Act relating to legal actions concerning protected speech.
Title
Enacts the Uniform Public Expression Protection Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-18 | House | Referred to committee: Civil Justice |
2024-06-17 | House | Introduced |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Passed |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Referred to committee: Judiciary |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
House Civil Justice Committee
Senate Judiciary Committee
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
House Civil Justice Committee
Senate Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 05 | 02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 47 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 47 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 47 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 47 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 47 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 47 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |