OH SB226 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 55-26)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - Effective 3/30/18 - Emergency: effective March 30, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3311.50, 5705.215, 5739.02, 5739.03, and 5739.05 of the Revised Code to provide for a permanent three-day sales tax "holiday" each August during which sales of clothing and school supplies are exempt from sales and use tax, to authorize a county school financing district property tax for school safety, security, and mental health services, and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Make sales tax holiday for clothes and school supplies permanent

Sponsors

Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]
Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]
Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]
Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]
Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Jack Cera [D]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Niraj Antani [R]
Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]
Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]
Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]
Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Sarah LaTourette [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]
Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30 Effective 3/30/18 - Emergency: effective March 30, 2018
2018-03-21SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-03-21HousePassed
2018-03-15HouseReported - Substitute: Ways and Means
2018-02-20HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2018-02-13HouseIntroduced
2018-02-07SenatePassed
2018-01-24SenateReported: Ways and Means
2017-11-15SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-10-31SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3311Amended CodeCitation Text
331150Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5705Amended CodeCitation Text
5705215Amended CodeCitation Text
5739Amended CodeCitation Text
573902Amended CodeCitation Text
573903Amended CodeCitation Text
573905Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback