OH SB226 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-25)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 51-25)
Status: Passed on July 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 5533.411 of the Revised Code to designate a portion of State Route 41 in Miami County as the "Sheriff's Sgt. Robert "Bobby" Elliott Memorial Highway."
Title
To designate a portion of State Route 41 in Miami County as the "Sheriff's Sgt. Robert "Bobby" Elliott Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-10 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-12 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-03-12 | Concurrence | |
2014-01-22 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-15 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-05 | To Transportation | |
2013-11-05 | Introduced to House | |
2014-03-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-19 | Committee Report | |
2014-01-23 | To Transportation, Public Safety and Homeland Security | |
2014-01-23 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 33 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 33 | 411 | New Code | See Bill Text |