OH SB219 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-07-21 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-07-21 - Effective Date
Summary
To amend section 2901.13 of the Revised Code to make the period of limitation for the criminal prosecution of a person for an offense directly related to misconduct in office of a public servant the same as the period of limitation for the criminal prosecution of that public servant for the offense involving the public servant's misconduct in office.
Title
Coordinate statutes of limitation-misconduct in office/related offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-21 | Effective Date | |
2008-04-21 | Governor Action | |
2008-04-23 | End of 10-day Period | |
2008-04-11 | Sent to Governor | |
2007-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2007-11-15 | Committee Report | |
2007-09-20 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2007-09-20 | Introduced to House | |
2008-04-09 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2008-04-08 | Committee Report | |
2007-12-12 | To Criminal Justice | |
2007-12-12 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_219 |