OH SB215 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective 6/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 50-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective 6/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1547.69, 2923.12, 2923.121, 2923.122, 2923.123, 2923.126, 2923.128, 2923.16, and 2953.37 and to enact section 2923.111 of the Revised Code regarding a concealed handgun licensee's duty to carry the license and notify a law enforcement officer if the licensee is carrying a concealed handgun, and a right of a qualifying adult to carry a concealed handgun in the same manner as if the person was a licensee.
Title
Regards concealed handgun licensee duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 58 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective 6/13/22 | |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2022-03-02 | House | Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Reported - Substitute: Government Oversight |
2022-01-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight |
2021-12-22 | House | Introduced |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Passed |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety |
2021-08-05 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Courts and Civil Law
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Courts and Civil Law : Civil Law
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Crime and Punishment
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Firearms
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 47 | 69 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 23 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 122 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 126 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 53 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |