OH SB207 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2919.25, 2929.13, and 2929.14 of the Revised Code to expand the offense of domestic violence to also prohibit a person from knowingly impeding the normal breathing or circulation of the blood of a family or household member by applying pressure to the family or household member's throat or neck or blocking the family or household member's nose or mouth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expand felonious assault to include suffocation or strangulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-29HouseIntroduced
2018-11-28SenatePassed
2018-11-28SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2017-10-25SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-10-03SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2903Amended CodeCitation Text
290311Amended CodeCitation Text
2919Amended CodeCitation Text
291925Amended CodeCitation Text
2929Amended CodeCitation Text
292913Amended CodeCitation Text
292914Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback