OH SB205 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-29 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1701.01, 1701.03, 1701.04, 1701.05, 1701.38, 1701.59, 1701.591, and 1701.94 and to enact section 1701.96 of the Revised Code to allow a corporation to become a benefit corporation.
Title
Allow a corporation to become a benefit corporation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | House | Introduced |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Passed |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Reported: Judiciary |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 01 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 38 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 591 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 94 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 96 | New Code | See Bill Text |