OH SB204 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-25)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-25)
Status: Passed on May 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-25 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 4757.50 and 4757.511 of the Revised Code to enter into the Counseling Compact.
Title
Enter the Counseling Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Effective 9/13/22 | |
2022-05-25 | House | Passed |
2022-05-23 | House | Reported: Behavioral Health and Recovery Supports |
2021-11-17 | House | Refer to Committee: Behavioral Health and Recovery Supports |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-10-06 | Senate | Reported: Health |
2021-09-08 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Health and Human Services
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Occupational Licensing and Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 57 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 57 | 511 | New Code | See Bill Text |